This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 07:04:35 (UTC).

Sandra Janine Briley vs. Esperanza Y Garcia

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 Sandra Janine Briley filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Esperanza Y Garcia. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Briley, Sandra Janine

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Garcia, Esperanza Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

DATZKER, LEIGH A.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Kwasigroch, Michael D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Amended; Answer to Cross-Complaint of Esperanza Yolanda Garcia) filed by Briley, Sandra Janine on 04/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Answer to Cross Complaint of Esperanza Yolanda Garcia) filed by Briley, Sandra Janine on 04/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Briley, Sandra Janine on 04/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Garcia, Esperanza Y on 03/24/2022. Filed By: Garcia, Esperanza Y(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Briley, Sandra(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Garcia, Esperanza Y on 03/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted) filed by Garcia, Esperanza Y on 03/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketGarcia, Esperanza Y Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Garcia, Esperanza Y on 03/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer submitted by Garcia, Esperanza Y rejected on 03/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Briley, Sandra Janine on 02/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Briley, Sandra Janine on 01/07/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Briley, Sandra Janine on 01/07/2022. Filed By: Briley, Sandra Janine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Garcia, Esperanza(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kwasigroch, Michael D.