Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:42 (UTC).

Sandra Hernandez vs. Las Islas Family Medical Group

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Sandra Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Las Islas Family Medical Group. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Sandra

Defendants

Guerrero, Irene

Las Islas Family Medical Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zarkowski, Constance N

Defendant Attorney

MEPPEN, DEBRA ELLWOOD

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:03 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Consolidate (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:03 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2014
  • Objection (of defts Las Islas Family Medical Group and Irene Guerrero to consolidation of cases) filed by Las Islas Family Medical Group; Guerrero, Irene on 08/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2014
  • Answer (to Complaint) filed by Las Islas Family Medical Group; Guerrero, Irene on 08/20/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • Proof of Personal Service - Petition (summons and complaint, etc. signed by Roy Schneider) filed by Hernandez, Sandra on 08/08/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons, complaint, etc.) submitted by Hernandez, Sandra rejected on 08/04/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons, complaint, notice of related case, etc.) filed by Hernandez, Sandra on 08/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Notice of Related Case (56.2013.00443639.CU.OE.VTA) filed by Hernandez, Sandra on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/21/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Sandra on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Hernandez, Sandra on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Hernandez, Sandra(Plaintiff) Refers To: Las Islas Family Medical Group(Defendant) | Guerrero, Irene(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Las Islas Family Medical Clinic is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEPPEN DEBRA ELLWOOD