This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 14:34:42 (UTC).

San Jose Neurospine vs. Sutter Health

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 San Jose Neurospine filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sutter Health. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

San Jose Neurospine

Defendants

Sutter Health Plan

Palo Alto Foundation Medical Group Inc

Sutter Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Van Parys, Nicholas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Previously Dismissed on 11/13/2017) filed by San Jose Neurospine on 11/17/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/08/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by San Jose Neurospine on 11/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/08/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Jose Neurospine on 08/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed by San Jose Neurospine on 08/16/2017. Filed By: San Jose Neurospine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sutter Health(Defendant) | Palo Alto Foundation Medical Group Inc(Defendant) | Sutter Health Plan(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases where PALO ALTO FOUNDATION MEDICAL GROUP, INC., a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SUTTER HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN PARYS NICHOLAS H