This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:17:32 (UTC).

San Jose Neurospine vs. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Case Summary

On 09/16/2016 San Jose Neurospine filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

San Jose Neurospine

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Van Parys, Nicholas

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KESHAVARZI, MOE

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 6 day jury trial; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 6 day jury trial; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 6 day jury trial; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 10/11/2017 at 10:30:00 AM in 22 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; San Jose Neurospine on 01/31/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Answer (to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc on 11/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Complaint - Amended (Second) filed by San Jose Neurospine on 11/14/2016. Filed By: San Jose Neurospine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Stipulation and Order (to grant plaintiff leave to file second amended complaint) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc on 11/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • Complaint - Amended (First) filed by San Jose Neurospine on 10/11/2016. Filed By: San Jose Neurospine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/15/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by San Jose Neurospine on 09/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Complaint filed by San Jose Neurospine on 09/16/2016. Filed By: San Jose Neurospine(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less