This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 08:53:33 (UTC).

Sam Roter vs. Irma Navarrete

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Sam Roter filed an Other lawsuit against Irma Navarrete. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Roter, Sam

Respondent

Navarrete, Irma

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (EA-100 Request for Elder Abuse Restraining Order; EA-109 Notice of Court Hearing; EA-110; etc) filed by Roter, Sam on 12/15/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) submitted by Roter, Sam rejected on 12/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: Temporary Restraining Order; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 11:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Temporary Restraining Order scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 11:30:00 AM in 32 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketHearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 12/29/2020 at 01:30:00 PM in 33 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Roter, Sam on 11/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Denied) filed by Roter, Sam on 11/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Roter, Sam on 11/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Roter, Sam on 11/20/2020. Filed By: Roter, Sam(Petitioner) Refers To: Navarrete, Irma(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less