This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 15:13:55 (UTC).

Sam Hill vs Waltom Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 10/10/2012 Sam Hill filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Waltom Construction Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Sam Hill & Sons Inc

Waltom Construction Inc

Center Glass Company

Genard Inc

Kaiser Air Conditioning and Sheet Metal Inc

Kenz Plumbing Inc

R Cold Inc

Summer Construction Inc

Woodward, Woody Lee

Deardorff-Jackson Company Inc a California Corporation

REBER LANDSCAPE CONSTRUCTION INC

Center Glass Co No 9

GOLD COAST ERECTORS INC

Casco Equipment Corporation

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Waltom Construction Inc

Center Glass Company

Genard Inc

Kaiser Air Conditioning and Sheet Metal Inc

Kenz Plumbing Inc

R Cold Inc

Summer Construction Inc

Woodward, Woody Lee

Deardorff-Jackson Company Inc a California Corporation

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Feingold, Erik B.

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Tredway, David W

NORMAN, RICHARD M.

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Feingold, Erik B.

Golan, Anna

Tredway, David W

KAISER, MICHAEL R

FLOCK, JOHN K.

YOUNG, KENYON M

O'MEARA, JOHN V.

NORMAN, RICHARD M.

MONTGOMERY, MICHAEL T.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint; Description: Motion to Amend Cross Complaint; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • Request for Dismissal submitted by Waltom Construction Inc rejected on 05/07/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Scott Deardorff Agent for Service) filed by Waltom Construction Inc on 11/19/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Waltom Construction Inc on 11/13/2012. Filed By: Waltom Construction Inc(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Deardorff-Jackson Company Inc a California Corporation(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Deardorff-Jackson Company Inc a California Corporation added as a Cross - Defendant effective 11/13/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Answer filed by Waltom Construction Inc on 11/13/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • Tredway, David W added as a effective 11/13/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sam Hill & Sons Inc on 10/29/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/11/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sam Hill & Sons Inc on 10/10/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • Complaint filed by Sam Hill & Sons Inc on 10/10/2012. Filed By: Sam Hill & Sons Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Waltom Construction Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less