This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 22:15:06 (UTC).

Sadaf Restaurant vs. County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 Sadaf Restaurant filed an Other lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC

Defendants

California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control

County of Ventura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vahdat, Sean Sasan

Hawkins, James R.

Defendant Attorney

Colantuono, Michael G

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:45 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

11/29/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge on JCCP 5180) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 11/29/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

DocketPast Events - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: [Class Action]; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2021

DocketCMC: Complex Track - [Class Action] scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketNotice of Ruling (on Petition for Coordination) filed by Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC on 10/20/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021

DocketStipulation and Order (Order Continuing Case Management Conference) filed by County of Ventura on 08/24/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2021

DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Defendant County of Ventura's Time to Respond to Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC's Complaint Order) filed by County of Ventura on 08/24/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2021

DocketPast Events - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Description: [Class Action]; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021

DocketCase Management Statement filed by County of Ventura on 08/18/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021

DocketStipulation and Order ((Proposed) Order Continuing Case Management Conference (Routed to CR43)) received from County of Ventura on 08/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2021

DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Defendant County of Ventura's Time to Respond to Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC's Complaint (Proposed) Order (Routed to CR43)) received from County of Ventura on 08/18/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
07/30/2021

DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (Served Kenneth C Jones Supervising Deputy Attorney General) filed by Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC on 07/30/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2021

DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt submitted by Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC rejected on 07/28/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2021

DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon Monica Sanchez, Office Assistant Clerk of the Court) filed by Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC on 07/28/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 07/13/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketDesignated class action on 07/13/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase Document - Event Time: 2:45 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2021

DocketMinutes finalized for heard 06/29/2021 02:45:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC on 06/08/2021.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2021

DocketComplaint filed by Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC on 06/08/2021. Filed By: Sadaf Restaurant Thousand Oaks LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: California Department of Alcoholic Beverage Control(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less