This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 17:17:26 (UTC).

Sabit vs Abou-Samra M.D.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2012 Sabit filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Abou-Samra M D. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Respondents

Aria Sabit M.D. a Professional Corporation

Sabit M.D., Aria Omar

Defendants, Respondent / Appellees and Cross Appellants

Abou-Samra M D , Moustapha

Beaghler M D , Marc

Community Memorial Health System

Golden M D , Thomas F

Mazurek M D , Robert T

Medical Staff of Community Memorial Hospital of San Buenaventura

Small D O , Samuel D

Speitel M D , William A

Abou Samra M.D., Moustapha

Beaghler M.D., Marc

Golden M.D., Thomas F

Mazurek M.D., Robert T

Moustapha Abou Samra MD a Professional Corporation

Small D.O., Samuel D

Speitel M.D., William A

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Golding, Jonathan F

Defendant, Respondent / Appellee and Cross Appellant Attorneys

MCDERMOTT, JAMES Q.

KJAR, JAMES J.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:29 PM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:35 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:21 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:25 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike or Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (SHC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
286 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2012
  • Mazurek M.D., Robert T added as a Defendant effective 12/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Small D.O., Samuel D added as a Defendant effective 12/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Beaghler M.D., Marc added as a Defendant effective 12/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Medical Staff of Community Memorial Hospital of San Buenaventura added as a Defendant effective 12/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Community Memorial Health System added as a Defendant effective 12/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • Abou-Samra M.D., Moustapha added as a Defendant effective 12/06/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/06/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sabit M.D., Aria Omar; Aria Sabit M.D. a Professional Corporation on 12/03/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • Complaint filed by Sabit M.D., Aria Omar; Aria Sabit M.D. a Professional Corporation on 12/03/2012. Filed By: Sabit M.D., Aria Omar(Plaintiff) | Aria Sabit M.D. a Professional Corporation(Plaintiff) Refers To: Community Memorial Health System(Defendant) | Medical Staff of Community Memorial Hospital of San Buenaventura(Defendant) | Beaghler M.D., Marc(Defendant) | Small D.O., Samuel(Defendant) | Mazurek M.D., Robert(Defendant) | Speitel M.D., William(Defendant) | Golden M.D., Thomas(Defendant) | Moustapha Abou Samra MD a Professional Corporation(Defendant) | Community Memorial Health System(Defendant) | Abou Samra M.D., Moustapha(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less