This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:40 (UTC).

Ruiz Patino vs. County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Ruiz Patino filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe

Defendants

COUNTY OF VENTURA

County of Ventura Human Services Agency

Duncan, Jaime

Flack, Lauri

Zimmerman, Barry L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ring, David R.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:35 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:08 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 2:35 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:08 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2014
  • Case Management Statement filed by COUNTY OF VENTURA; County of Ventura Human Services Agency; Duncan, Jaime; Flack, Lauri; Zimmerman, Barry L on 11/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Marina Porche - Assistant County Counsel) filed by Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe on 10/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Marina Porche - Assistant County Counsel) filed by Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe on 10/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Marina Porche - Assistant County Counsel) filed by Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe on 10/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Marina Porche - Assistant County Counsel) filed by Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe on 10/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Marina Porche - Assistant County Counsel) filed by Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe on 10/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/24/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Ruiz Patino, Maria Guadalupe(Plaintiff) Refers To: COUNTY OF VENTURA(Defendant) | County of Ventura Human Services Agency(Defendant) | Zimmerman, Barry(Defendant) | Duncan, Jaime(Defendant) | Flack, Lauri(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less