This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 00:02:03 (UTC).

Rosengren vs. Sprouts

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Rosengren filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sprouts. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosengren, Maria

Defendant

Sprouts Farmers Market Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abromson, Mak

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court) filed by SF Markets LLC on 02/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court (2:22-cv-00848 - Filed 02/07/22) filed by SF Markets LLC on 02/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (correcting defendant name from Sprouts Farmers Market Inc to correct name of SF Markets LLC) filed by Rosengren, Maria on 01/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon Brad Lukow-Agent) filed by Rosengren, Maria on 10/01/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rosengren, Maria on 06/29/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Rosengren, Maria on 06/29/2021. Filed By: Rosengren, Maria(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sprouts Farmers Market Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less