Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 09:02:00 (UTC).

Ronald Fischbach vs. Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates HOA Inc

Case Summary

On 11/17/2015 Ronald Fischbach filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates HOA Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fischbach, Ronald

Defendants

Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates HOA Inc

Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates II Inc

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 05/09/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2015
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Granted (until 1-25-16 at 9:00am S1) filed by Fischbach, Ronald on 12/16/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) (until 1-20-16) filed by Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates II Inc on 12/10/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) (until 1-20-16) filed by Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates HOA Inc on 12/10/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (signed by M. Teal; no date of delivery provided; $15.00) filed by Fischbach, Ronald on 11/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (signed by M. Teal; no date of delivery provided; $15.00) filed by Fischbach, Ronald on 11/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 12/21/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Fischbach, Ronald on 11/17/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Fischbach, Ronald on 11/17/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Fischbach, Ronald on 11/17/2015. Filed By: Fischbach, Ronald(Plaintiff) Refers To: Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates HOA Inc(Defendant) | Mountain Meadows Buttercreek Estates II Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less