This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 17:32:13 (UTC).

Robitaille vs. Tri Tech Restoration

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Robitaille filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tri Tech Restoration. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robitaille, Alan Spencer

Defendants

Tri Tech Restoration Co Inc

Cantero, Florentino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stoll, Robert J III

Defendant Attorney

BREMER, KEITH G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Cantero, Florentino; Tri Tech Restoration Co Inc on 11/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (56-2020-00541991, 56-2020-00541929, 56-2020-00546008) filed by Tri Tech Restoration Co Inc on 11/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES - Served Celia Cantero Florentino's Wife) filed by Robitaille, Alan Spencer on 11/05/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (STATEMENT OF DAMAGES - Served Sean Kavarian Authorized Agent) filed by Robitaille, Alan Spencer on 11/05/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Robitaille, Alan Spencer on 10/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Robitaille, Alan Spencer on 10/08/2020. Filed By: Robitaille, Alan Spencer(Plaintiff) Refers To: Tri Tech Restoration Co Inc(Defendant) | Cantero, Florentino(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tri Tech Restoration Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREMER KEITH