This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 03:59:06 (UTC).

Robert Winget vs. Adventist Health Simi Valley

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 Robert Winget filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Adventist Health Simi Valley. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Winget, Karen

Winget, Robert

Defendants

Adventist Health Simi Valley

Cordes MD, Eric

Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services

All Town Ambulance

Tang DO, Tung

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walkon, Bradley J

Defendant Attorney

Schaeffer, James C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketTang DO, Tung added as a Defendant effective 12/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 2 - Tung Tang DO) filed by Winget, Karen; Winget, Robert on 12/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketAll Town Ambulance added as a Defendant effective 11/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (adding DOE 1, All Town Ambulance) filed by Winget, Karen; Winget, Robert on 11/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Regarding Designation of Trial Counsel) filed by Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services on 09/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services on 09/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services on 09/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services on 09/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Clarissa Ochoa Patient Case Coordinator) filed by Winget, Karen; Winget, Robert on 09/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Clarissa Ochoa Patient Case Coordinator) filed by Winget, Karen; Winget, Robert on 09/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Winget, Robert; Winget, Karen on 08/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Winget, Robert; Winget, Karen on 08/18/2021. Filed By: Winget, Karen(Plaintiff) | Winget, Robert(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cordes MD, Eric(Defendant) | Adventist Health Simi Valley(Defendant) | Simi Valley Hospital and Health Care Services(Defendant) | All Town Ambulance(Defendant) | Tang DO, Tung(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL TOWN AMBULANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH WHITE MEMORIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHAEFFER, JAMES C