This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 22:15:13 (UTC).

Rios vs Robinson

Case Summary

On 11/28/2016 Rios filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Robinson. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Rios, Leslie

Renteria, Karla

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Robinson, Timothy

Robinson, Sally

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LAURIE, JOHN D

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 1:46 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 1:46 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: 7 day jury trial; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: Exparte application to continue trial and MSC; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Description: First Amended Cross Complaint; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Description: portions of the cross complaint of Sally Robinson; Memo of p&a's; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP (against Hon Kent Kellegrew) filed by Robinson, Sally on 02/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Summons issued on 02/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Robinson, Sally on 02/27/2017. Filed By: Robinson, Sally(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Rios, Leslie(Cross - Defendant) | Renteria, Karla(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Answer filed by Robinson, Sally; Robinson, Timothy on 02/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Sally Robinson-person in chg) filed by LAURIE, JOHN D; Renteria, Karla; Rios, Leslie; Robinson, Sally; Robinson, Timothy on 02/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by LAURIE, JOHN D; Renteria, Karla; Rios, Leslie; Robinson, Sally; Robinson, Timothy on 02/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/26/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rios, Leslie; Renteria, Karla on 11/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • Complaint filed by Rios, Leslie; Renteria, Karla on 11/28/2016. Filed By: Rios, Leslie(Plaintiff) | Renteria, Karla(Plaintiff) Refers To: Robinson, Sally(Defendant) | Robinson, Timothy(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less