This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 02:44:44 (UTC).

Rigoberto Perez vs. Hector Marquez Hernandez

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 Rigoberto Perez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Hector Marquez Hernandez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perez, Rigoberto

Defendants

Hernandez, Hector Marquez

Sanchez, Reyna Juarez

Santos, Reyna Juarez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mannis, Todd

Defendant Attorney

Repchian, Daniel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Santos, Reyna Juarez; Hernandez, Hector Marquez on 02/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Santos, Reyna Juarez; Hernandez, Hector Marquez on 02/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Santos, Reyna Juarez; Hernandez, Hector Marquez on 10/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSantos, Reyna Juarez added as a Defendant effective 10/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketPerez, Rigoberto Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (GRANTED) filed by Perez, Rigoberto on 07/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, Rigoberto on 07/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Perez, Rigoberto on 07/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Perez, Rigoberto on 07/09/2020. Filed By: Perez, Rigoberto(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hernandez, Hector(Defendant) | Sanchez, Reyna(Defendant) | Santos, Reyna(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REPCHIAN DANIEL