This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 00:53:44 (UTC).

Rex B Warman vs. Constance Burns

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 Rex B Warman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Constance Burns. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Warman, Rex B

Defendant

Burns, Constance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rista, Anthony J.

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Burns, Constance on 08/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDefault vacated as to Burns, Constance on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion to Set Aside Default heard 08/20/2020 08:20:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketTentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketReply (to Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Set Aside Default) filed by Burns, Constance on 08/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to Defts Motion to Set Aside Default, Memo of Points & Authorities, Declaration of Anthony J Rista in Support thereof and Request for Sanctions Per CCP 473b and CCP 127.8 against Def Constance Burns and Defts Legal Counsel Peter M Williamson Esq..etc) filed by Warman, Rex B on 08/04/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Court Judgment Received via E-Delivery on 06/10/2020) submitted by Warman, Rex B rejected on 07/08/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketAmount of 370.00 received for 172 - Answer or other 1st paper >$10K<=$25K on 06/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside Default (of Defendant Constance Burns; Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Declaration of Peter M. Williamson in Support thereof) filed by Burns, Constance on 06/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Warman, Rex B rejected on 06/18/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Burns, Constance on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Does 1 through 15 Inclusive) filed by Warman, Rex B on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Warman, Rex B on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/01/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Warman, Rex B on 01/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Warman, Rex B on 01/29/2020. Filed By: Warman, Rex B(Plaintiff) Refers To: Burns, Constance(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rista, Anthony J.