Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 07:24:50 (UTC).

Reimers vs. Operon Group

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Reimers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Operon Group. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reimers, Eileen

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Operon Group

Cross Defendant

Horrigan Cole Enterprises Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yorke, Brian

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DUNKIN, CRAIG L

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 2:09 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Pending Action) filed by Reimers, Eileen on 06/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 05/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Operon Group on 05/28/2021. Filed By: Operon Group(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Horrigan Cole Enterprises Inc(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketHorrigan Cole Enterprises Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 05/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Operon Group on 05/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 2:09 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 2:09 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 03/16/2021 02:09:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge Pursuant to 170.6 CCP (Judge Mark S Borrell) filed by Reimers, Eileen on 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Reimers, Eileen on 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Reimers, Eileen on 03/15/2021. Filed By: Reimers, Eileen(Plaintiff) Refers To: Operon Group(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Operon Group is a litigant

Latest cases where Horrigan Cole Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.