Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:45 (UTC).

Regency Centers LP vs. United Wireless Center.com Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Regency Centers LP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against United Wireless Center com Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regency Centers LP

Defendant

United Wireless Center.com Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Park, Ernie Zachary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2017
  • Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Regency Centers LP on 03/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Notice - Other (to pay or quit Declaration of Service) filed by Regency Centers LP on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Regency Centers LP on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Application for Writ of Possession filed by Regency Centers LP on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Writ issued on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Judgment for Regency Centers LP against United Wireless Center.com Inc. in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Regency Centers LP on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Default entered as to United Wireless Center.com Inc. on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Regency Centers LP on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Regency Centers LP on 07/11/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 48.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Regency Centers LP on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Regency Centers LP on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Regency Centers LP(Plaintiff) Refers To: United Wireless Center.com Inc.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less