This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 11:40:35 (UTC).

Redman vs B E McCarty

Case Summary

On 07/12/2012 Redman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against B E McCarty. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Redman, Damon

Redman, Sicili

Defendants

B E McCarty Inc

Zavala, Paula

Francis and Gloria Gularte Trust

Gularte, Francis

Gularte, Gloria

Ventura Crane

Zavala, Paul

Intervenors and Interested Parties

American Zurich Insurance Company

Hayward Baker Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VITITOE, JAMES W

Lira, David R

Defendant Attorney

Bergsten, Robert T

Intervenor Attorney

SUSSON, MARK

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Bifurcation; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Bifurcation; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:57 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:40 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:40 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2012
  • Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 01/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • Application - Other (and Declaration for Ex Parte Order Granting Leave to intervene forwarded to Judge Riley) received from American Zurich Insurance Company on 11/05/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • American Zurich Insurance Company added as a Interested Party effective 11/05/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • Answer (to Complaint; Request for Jury Trial) filed by Zavala, Paul on 09/11/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Adrian Zavala, son) filed by Redman, Damon on 08/29/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2012
  • Answer filed by B E McCarty Inc on 08/02/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Billy E. Mcarty, agent for service by service to Marilyn Lagomarsion, office manager) filed by Redman, Damon on 07/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Redman, Damon; Redman, Sicili on 07/12/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Complaint filed by Redman, Damon; Redman, Sicili on 07/12/2012. Filed By: Redman, Damon(Plaintiff) | Redman, Sicili(Plaintiff) Refers To: B E McCarty Inc(Defendant) | Zavala, Paul(Defendant) | Hayward Baker Inc(Interested Party) | American Zurich Insurance Company(Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less