This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/20/2023 at 03:02:34 (UTC).

Raymond A Perez vs. Anthony Domenick Scopelliti

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 Raymond A Perez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Anthony Domenick Scopelliti. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perez, Raymond A III

Defendants

Enterprise Truck Rental Inc

Home Depot USA Inc

EAN Holdings LLC

Scopelliti, Anthony Domenick Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Baumer, Benjamin L

TEMPLEMAN, BRETT C.

Defendant Attorney

FISHER, ROBERT A II

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 2:53 PM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 2:53 PM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference heard 01/24/2023 02:53:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - re: Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 04/26/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in 41 at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference heard 01/09/2023 08:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Perez, Raymond A III; Home Depot USA Inc; Scopelliti, Anthony Domenick Jr on 01/06/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Perez, Raymond A III on 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance RA-010 filed by Home Depot USA Inc; Scopelliti, Anthony Domenick Jr on 12/29/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Defendants EAN Holdings, LLC and Enterprise Truck Rental, Inc. Only) filed by Perez, Raymond A III on 10/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Ruling Re Results of The October 17, 2022 Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference) filed by Perez, Raymond A III on 10/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1,006 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: CMC: Bankruptcy Removal; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Status Conference; Description: RE: VISITATION; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Spousal Property Petition; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Case Management Conference; Description: Re filing & service of 4th amended complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/0008
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Permission to Use Trust Funds:Instructions on Trustees Authority to Change Legal Malpractice Attorne...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Description: Verify filing of 60 day evaluation report, general plan and inventory and appraisal; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 10:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Petition for Termination; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:59 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Description: File Proof of Service of Complaint of Countrywide Home Loans as to Defendant Kathleen Lazarus; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1CM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/0007
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PR); Description: Petition for Order Under Probate 850(a)(1)(D) for Transfer of Proceeds of Sale of Real Property to A...; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less