This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/11/2018 at 21:35:35 (UTC).

Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust vs. Washington Mutual Bank

Case Summary

On 02/05/2010 Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Washington Mutual Bank. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust

Hall, David S

Hall, Jeffrey C

Hall, Ray

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JPMorgan Chase Bank N A

WaMu of Jacksonville Florida

Bank of America National Association as Successor by Merger to Lasalle Bank NA as Trustee for WAMU M

California Reconveyance Co

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Fishman, Alan H

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

JPMorgan Chase NA an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the F

Kreider, Keith

McCarthy, Kevin R

Minkow, Brian

Professional Recovery Services Inc

Quality Loan Service Corp

Washington Mutual Bank

Bank of America National Association as Successor by Merger to Lasalle Bank NA as Trustee for WAMU Mortgage pass through Certificates Series 2006 AR13 Trust

JPMorgan Chase NA an acquirer of certain assets and liabilities of Washington Mutual Bank from the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Minkow, Brian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Spence, Darrell W

FINEMAN, LEE

Cross Defendant Attorney

Bacon, Theodore E

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 4:00 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: S5; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (LC); Event Time: 10:03 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (LC); Event Time: 9:58 AM; Department: S5; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: S1CM; Document: Tentative

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Failure to Proceed; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
295 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2010
  • Ex Parte - ex parte application for tro and osc scheduled for 02/26/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in S5 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (For Temporary Restraining Order and OSC) filed by Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust on 02/25/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/22/2010 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Ex Parte - ex parte application for TRO and OSC scheduled for 02/22/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in S5 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for TRO and OSC) filed by Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust on 02/18/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Case assigned to Department S5.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust on 02/05/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust on 02/05/2010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • Complaint filed by Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust on 02/05/2010. Filed By: Ray Hall as Trustee-in-Trust of the David Hall Trust(Plaintiff) Refers To: Washington Mutual Bank(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.