Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:13:54 (UTC).

Raul Sanchez vs. Susan Burdullis

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Raul Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Susan Burdullis. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanchez, Raul

Defendants

Burdullis, Ken

Burdullis, Susan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dougherty, Gerard M.

Defendant Attorney

Wright, David M.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (time estimate 7 days); Event Status: REASSIGNED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (time estimate 7 days); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2014
  • Case Management Statement filed by Sanchez, Raul on 11/13/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • Case Management Statement filed by Burdullis, Susan; Burdullis, Ken on 10/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Burdullis, Susan; Burdullis, Ken on 07/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • Answer filed by Burdullis, Susan; Burdullis, Ken on 07/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Susan Burdullis) filed by Sanchez, Raul on 07/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sanchez, Raul on 07/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/21/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sanchez, Raul on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Sanchez, Raul on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Sanchez, Raul(Plaintiff) Refers To: Burdullis, Susan(Defendant) | Burdullis, Ken(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less