This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 16:12:27 (UTC).

Rande Lance vs. State Of California

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 Rande Lance filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against State Of California. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Lance, Lorraine

Lance, Rande

Hopper, Jimmy David Jr

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

State Of California

The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation

Hopper, Jimmy David Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WELLS, RANDY E

HOWARD, JOHN H

TEMPLEMAN, BRETT C.

Michaelson, Lindsay J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Austin, David A

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Michaelson, Lindsay J

Austin, David A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2018
  • Cross-Complaint filed by The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation on 03/09/2018. Filed By: The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Hopper, Jimmy(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Hopper, Jimmy David Jr added as a Cross - Defendant effective 03/09/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Answer filed by The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation on 03/09/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation added as a Defendant effective 03/09/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Case Management Statement filed by Lance, Lorraine; Lance, Rande on 02/27/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Ms. Bardford) filed by Lance, Rande on 02/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/12/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lance, Rande; Lance, Lorraine on 10/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Complaint filed by Lance, Rande; Lance, Lorraine on 10/02/2017. Filed By: Lance, Rande(Plaintiff) | Lance, Lorraine(Plaintiff) Refers To: State Of California(Defendant) | The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AUSTIN DAVID A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAELSON LINDSAY J.