This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/04/2023 at 06:53:19 (UTC).

Ramona R Alonzo vs. Sonia E Alonzo

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 Ramona R Alonzo filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Sonia E Alonzo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alonzo, Ramona R

Respondent

Alonzo, Sonia E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Felix, Daniella T.

Respondent Attorney

Hankey, Jordan D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) (Amended) filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 07/11/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re: mutual waiver of attorney's fees and costs; filing of Amended Civil Harassment Restraining Order after hearing to reflect the courts actual order) filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 07/11/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketAmended Order (Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing) received from Alonzo, Ramona R on 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Re: Mutual Waiver of Attorney's Fees and Costs; Filing of Amended Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing to Reflect the Court's Actual Order) received from Alonzo, Ramona R on 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Re Firearms) filed by Alonzo, Sonia E on 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) (Expires 05/13/27) filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketExhibit List filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Christian Bosuel in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Continue Trial) filed by Alonzo, Sonia E on 04/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing filed by Alonzo, Sonia E on 04/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (CH-100 Request for CHRO; CH-109 Ntc of Crt Hrng; CH-110 TRO: etc.) filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 02/25/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketHearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders - scheduled for 04/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in 34 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 02/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Granted) filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 02/16/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 34.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketConsent For Court Assignment filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 02/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 02/14/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by Alonzo, Ramona R on 02/14/2022. Filed By: Alonzo, Ramona R(Petitioner) Refers To: Alonzo, Sonia(Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANKEY JORDAN D.