Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 23:05:47 (UTC).

Ralston vs Ventura Vagabond Inn LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Ralston filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ventura Vagabond Inn LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ralston, Jeanne

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

VENTURA VAGABOND INN LLC

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard, David A

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN, JAMES N

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (4 Day); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: for Trial Preference; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (complaint) filed by Ralston, Jeanne on 07/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement (dism 8/2/19) filed by Ralston, Jeanne on 06/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 06/21/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Jury Trial (LC) - (4 Day) scheduled for 07/22/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Notice - Other (of MSC and Trial Dates) filed by Ralston, Jeanne on 04/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2019
  • Summons issued on 03/07/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Cross-Complaint filed by VENTURA VAGABOND INN LLC on 03/07/2019. Filed By: VENTURA VAGABOND INN LLC(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: ROES 1 TO 50(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • ROES 1 TO 50 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 03/07/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Answer filed by VENTURA VAGABOND INN LLC on 03/07/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Ralston, Jeanne rejected on 03/05/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served jThoedore J Cohen Agent for Service) filed by Ralston, Jeanne on 02/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ralston, Jeanne on 11/19/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Complaint filed by Ralston, Jeanne on 11/19/2018. Filed By: Ralston, Jeanne(Plaintiff) Refers To: VENTURA VAGABOND INN LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard, David A