Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/05/2020 at 08:42:13 (UTC).

Racquel Taylor vs. Mark D Pratt DDS

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Racquel Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mark D Pratt DDS. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylor, Racquel

Defendant

Pratt DDS, Mark D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lucero, Linda D

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Description: Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Case Management Statement; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/06/2020 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute submitted by Taylor, Racquel rejected on 03/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Other (of CMC) filed by Taylor, Racquel on 03/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Taylor, Racquel on 03/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/25/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undeliverable (Order on Court Fee Waiver - Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 05/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted In Whole) filed by Taylor, Racquel on 05/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketTaylor, Racquel Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/07/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Taylor, Racquel on 05/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Taylor, Racquel on 05/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint filed by Taylor, Racquel on 05/14/2019. Filed By: Taylor, Racquel(Plaintiff) Refers To: Pratt DDS, Mark(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA DARLENE