This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 04:10:11 (UTC).

Rachel Hernandez vs. Power Auto

Case Summary

On 06/29/2015 Rachel Hernandez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Power Auto. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hernandez, Rachel

Defendants

Hernandez, Eddie

Power Auto

Hernandez, Heriberto Eddie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iarusso, Michelle

Defendant Attorney

Mabie, Thomas H

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2015
  • Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Hernandez, Rachel on 12/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Case Management Statement filed by Hernandez, Rachel on 12/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Case Management Statement filed by Power Auto; Hernandez, Heriberto Eddie on 11/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Answer filed by Power Auto; Hernandez, Heriberto Eddie on 11/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Mabie, Thomas H added as a effective 11/30/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • Hernandez, Eddie added as a Defendant effective 07/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/02/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hernandez, Rachel on 06/29/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Complaint filed by Hernandez, Rachel on 06/29/2015. Filed By: Hernandez, Rachel(Plaintiff) Refers To: Power Auto(Defendant) | Hernandez, Eddie(Defendant) | Hernandez, Heriberto(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less