This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 19:05:12 (UTC).

Protocol Agency Inc vs. Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center

Case Summary

On 01/22/2013 Protocol Agency Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Protocol Agency Inc

Defendant

Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2013
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2016
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Protocol Agency Inc on 02/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (Re: James H Peace, Doctor- Agent for Service; served on 1-22-13 cost 75.00) filed by Protocol Agency Inc on 02/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/25/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/25/2013 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Protocol Agency Inc on 01/22/2013. Filed By: Protocol Agency Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Medical Staff of Olympia Medical Center(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF OF OLYMPIA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where PROTOCOL AGENCY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant