This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 20:11:56 (UTC).

Profett MD vs Schoengold MD

Case Summary

On 11/05/2014 Profett MD filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Schoengold MD. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Proffett MD, Gary J

Defendants

Alan Schoengold MD Prof Corp

McKesson Corporation

Seaview IPA

Alan Schoengold M.D. Professional Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Holzman, Daniel M

Defendant Attorney

LIGHT, JONATHAN FRASER

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (MSC); Event Time: 2:05 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:13 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (MSC); Event Time: 2:05 PM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:13 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/03/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2015
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Proffett MD, Gary J on 01/02/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • Answer filed by Alan Schoengold MD Prof Corp; Seaview IPA on 12/31/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Becky DeGeorge, agt) filed by Proffett MD, Gary J on 12/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Summons issued on 11/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/03/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/03/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Proffett MD, Gary J on 11/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • Complaint filed by Proffett MD, Gary J on 11/05/2014. Filed By: Proffett MD, Gary J(Plaintiff) Refers To: McKesson Corporation(Defendant) | Seaview IPA(Defendant) | Alan Schoengold MD Prof Corp(Defendant) | Alan Schoengold M.D. Professional Corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less