Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:26 (UTC).

Prime Peninsula LP vs. Susie Wood

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Prime Peninsula LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Susie Wood. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prime Peninsula LP

Defendants

Dall, Greg

Wood, Susie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evans, Chris J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2017
  • Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • Writ of Possession Returned (satisfied) filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 10/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Writ issued on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Application for Writ of Possession filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Judgment for Prime Peninsula LP against Dall, Greg ;Wood, Susie in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Default entered as to Dall, Greg on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Default entered as to Wood, Susie on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (and clerks judgment) filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 07/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 48.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Prime Peninsula LP on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Prime Peninsula LP(Plaintiff) Refers To: Wood, Susie(Defendant) | Dall, Greg(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less