This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/11/2018 at 06:09:45 (UTC).

Prime Home Healthcare Inc vs. Portola Properties LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2009 Prime Home Healthcare Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Portola Properties LLC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Prime Home Healthcare Inc

Defendants

Pescador Properties LLC

Portola Properties LLC

Tapo Street LLC

The Simpson Company Inc

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 2:00 PM; Department: S4; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 2:00 PM; Department: S4; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: REASSIGNED; Event Time: 2:00 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 2:00 PM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (FULLY Satisfied) filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 06/16/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Ventura generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Judgment for Prime Home Healthcare Inc against Portola Properties LLC;Pescador Properties LLC;Tapo Street LLC;The Simpson Company Inc in the amount of: 3500.00 principal, 90.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 05/18/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment contested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 05/18/2009 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • The Court finds judgment for Prime Home Healthcare Inc against Pescador Properties LLC Portola Properties LLC The Simpson Company Inc Tapo Street LLC in the amount of $3500.00 principal, $90.00 costs - After Hearing - Judgment contested on 5/18/09. Other info:None.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 05/18/2009 at 02:00:00 PM in S4 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2009
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (signed by C. Boyd) filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/10/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (signed by C. Boyd) filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/10/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 05/18/2009 at 02:00:00 PM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/04/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/04/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/04/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/04/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/04/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Prime Home Healthcare Inc on 03/04/2009. Filed By: Prime Home Healthcare Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Portola Properties LLC(Defendant) | Pescador Properties LLC(Defendant) | Tapo Street LLC(Defendant) | The Simpson Company Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pescador Properties LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE SIMPSON CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant