This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 07:29:06 (UTC).

Prentice vs. Rite Aid

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Prentice filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Rite Aid. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Beakes, Phillip

Prentice, Deborah L

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Rite Aid Corporation

Oliveira Place SPE LLC

Align REI

Oliveira Plaza Associates LLC

F Oliveira Ranch Co Lessor

Oliveira Plaza SPC LLC LSE

Thrifty Payless Inc

Oliveira Plaza SPE LLC

Cross Defendant

Clark Contractors Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stewart, Katherine A

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Shayne, Joshua

Gates, James W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 04/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Thrifty Payless Inc; Oliveira Plaza SPE LLC; Align REI on 04/07/2021. Filed By: Thrifty Payless Inc(Cross - Complainant) | Oliveira Plaza SPE LLC(Cross - Complainant) | Align REI(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Clark Contractors Inc(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketClark Contractors Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 04/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Plaintiffs Deborah Prentice and Philip Beakes Complaint) filed by Align REI; Oliveira Plaza SPE LLC on 03/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Heather Silverman Legal Secretary) filed by Beakes, Phillip; Prentice, Deborah L on 02/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Daisy Montenegro, CT Corp) filed by Prentice, Deborah L on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Stefoni Murphy, CT Corp, Authorized) filed by Prentice, Deborah L on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Jim Doe, Person in Charge of Office) filed by Prentice, Deborah L on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Non Service (Summons, Complaint) filed by Prentice, Deborah L on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Monicka Creary CT Corp System) filed by Beakes, Phillip; Prentice, Deborah L on 02/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Thrifty Payless Inc on 02/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketShayne, Joshua added as a effective 02/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketThrifty Payless Inc added as a Defendant effective 02/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by F Oliveira Ranch Co Lessor on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Prentice, Deborah L; Beakes, Phillip on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Prentice, Deborah L; Beakes, Phillip on 01/04/2021. Filed By: Prentice, Deborah L(Plaintiff) | Beakes, Phillip(Plaintiff) Refers To: Rite Aid Corporation(Defendant) | Align REI(Defendant) | Oliveira Plaza SPE LLC(Defendant) | F Oliveira Ranch Co Lessor(Defendant) | Oliveira Plaza SPC LLC LSE(Defendant) | Oliveira Plaza Associates LLC(Defendant) | Thrifty Payless Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oliveira Plaza Associates LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shayne, Joshua