This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 03:35:40 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Mario Ramirez

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mario Ramirez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Ramirez, Mario

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ritton, Jaime

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketAbstract issued on 07/13/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketOSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - scheduled for 07/28/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Ramirez, Mario in the amount of: 2607.67 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 284.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 06/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Civil Code 1788.50 et. seq. - Fair Debt Buying Practices Act filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketOSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - scheduled for 07/28/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court submitted by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC rejected on 08/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (interest and atty fees) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 08/09/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60a) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 08/09/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketDefault entered as to Ramirez, Mario on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and court judgment) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 08/09/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/11/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ramirez, Mario(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RITTON, JAIME Y.