Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:02 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Laura Destefano

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laura Destefano. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Destefano, Laura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, LORI N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 09/10/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 07/30/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Destefano, Laura(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less