Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:14:04 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Elizabeth Ellis

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Elizabeth Ellis. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Ellis, Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, LORI N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2015
  • Writ issued on 11/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Proof of Service - MAILING (Judgment-JUD 100) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Judgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Ellis, Elizabeth in the amount of: 6976.65 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 280.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Supplemental (Declaration in support of Request to enter default judgment and waiver of atty fees. Account purchase date CC1788.50d) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Default entered as to Ellis, Elizabeth on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 07/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/27/2014. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ellis, Elizabeth(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less