This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 03:52:08 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Assoc vs. Gomez Bautista

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Portfolio Recovery Assoc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gomez Bautista. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Defendant

Gomez Bautista, Maria A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ritton, Jaime

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketAbstract issued on 11/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketJudgment for Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC against Gomez Bautista, Maria A in the amount of: 2851.11 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 284.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 08/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 08/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (RE interest costs CCP1033, atty fees) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 08/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Application for Default Judgment (CCP1788.60a) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 08/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketDefault entered as to Gomez Bautista, Maria A on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and court judgment) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 07/25/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Arturo Doe) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/08/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Gomez Bautista, Maria(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RITTON, JAIME Y.