Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2021 at 05:00:49 (UTC).

Plouf vs Community Memorial Hospital

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Plouf filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Community Memorial Hospital. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Plouf, Robert R

Plouf, Karin

Defendants

Community Memorial Hospital

Community Memorial Health System

Community Memorial Health System Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ercolani, Russ W

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN, BRIAN L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAmended (Case Management Statement) filed by Community Memorial Health System Inc on 04/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Community Memorial Health System Inc on 04/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Community Memorial Health System Inc on 09/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Trial Attorney) filed by Community Memorial Health System Inc on 09/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Community Memorial Health System Inc on 09/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCommunity Memorial Health System Inc added as a Defendant effective 09/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Maureen Archam Bault Authorized to Accept Servie for Registered Agent Gary Wilde Chief Executive Officer) filed by Plouf, Karin; Plouf, Robert R on 08/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of service (AMENDED) (by Personal Service. Served Maureen Archam Bault Authorized to Accept Service for Registered Agent, Gary Wilde Chief Executive Officer) filed by Plouf, Karin; Plouf, Robert R on 08/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served-Maureen Archambault,Authorized to Accept Service for Registered Agent-Gary Wilde,Chief Executive Officer) filed by Plouf, Robert R on 08/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/10/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Plouf, Robert R; Plouf, Karin on 08/12/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Plouf, Robert R; Plouf, Karin on 08/12/2020. Filed By: Plouf, Robert R(Plaintiff) | Plouf, Karin(Plaintiff) Refers To: Community Memorial Health System(Defendant) | Community Memorial Hospital(Defendant) | Community Memorial Health System Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Community Memorial Health Systems is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOFFMAN BRIAN L. ESQ.