This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 07:40:45 (UTC).

Philip D Dapeer a Law Corp vs Fox

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 Philip D Dapeer a Law Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fox. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation

Defendant

Fox, Marilyn J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dapeer, Philip D

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment (Fully Satisfied) filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 03/02/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketOSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - scheduled for 07/15/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketJudgment for Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation against Fox, Marilyn J in the amount of: 125745.60 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 509.50 costs, 62078.90 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/11/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 07/11/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketRequest - Other (for Continuance of Order to Show Cause) filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 07/09/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Summary of the Case) filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 07/03/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Calculation of Pre Judgment Interest) filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 07/03/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Philip D Dapeer in Support of Entry of Default Judgment) filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 07/03/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 02/20/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketMinutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 12/14/2018 08:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/15/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 11/21/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/14/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 07/20/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed by Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation on 07/20/2018. Filed By: Philip D Dapeer a Law Corporation(Plaintiff) Refers To: Fox, Marilyn(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAPEER PHILIP D. ESQ.