This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:17:39 (UTC).

Peter Sabolch vs. Martin Francis Kaplan

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 Peter Sabolch filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Martin Francis Kaplan. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sabolch, Peter

Defendants

The Estate of Martin Francis Kaplan

Kaplan, Martin Francis

Kaplan, Lydia M

Estate of Martin Francis Kaplan Deceased

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LETTENMAIER, ARTHUR J.

Defendant Attorney

Pennington, Amy K

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Description: Prayer for Punitive Damages from Plaintiff's Complaint; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Case Management Statement filed by Kaplan, Lydia M on 07/30/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2019
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 03/01/2019 08:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/01/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension filed by Kaplan, Lydia M on 03/01/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Case Management Statement filed by Sabolch, Peter on 03/01/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Sabolch, Peter on 02/08/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment VENTURA generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/01/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sabolch, Peter on 10/03/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Complaint filed by Sabolch, Peter on 10/03/2018. Filed By: Sabolch, Peter(Plaintiff) Refers To: Kaplan, Lydia(Defendant) | Kaplan, Martin(Defendant) | The Estate of Martin Francis Kaplan(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PENNINGTON AMY