This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:15:28 (UTC).

Peete vs Air & Liquid Systems Corp

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 Peete filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corp. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Armstrong International Inc

CBS Corporation a Delaware corporation fka Viacom Inc successor by merger to CBS Corporation a Pennsylvania corporation fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Grinnell LLC

Cleaver Brooks Inc

Owens Ilinois inc

BW IP Inc

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

Trane US Inc

Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc

Cosmodyne LLC

Warren Pumps LLC

Flowserve Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation

Nibco Inc

National Steel & Shipbuilding Company

Continental Maritime of San Diego Inc

IMO Industries Inc

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc

Aurora Pump Company

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Fishback, Stephen M.

Prindle, Kenneth B

RIDLEY, SHAWN M

Smith, Harrison S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party submitted by Peete, Louis; Peete, Rosie rejected on 04/19/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Peete, Louis; Peete, Rosie on 01/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet submitted by Mueller Steam Specialty rejected on 01/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Answer submitted by Mueller Steam Specialty rejected on 01/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Answer submitted by National Steel & Shipbuilding Company rejected on 01/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Answer submitted by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY rejected on 01/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Answer submitted by Tuthill Corporation rejected on 01/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Answer submitted by Grinnell LLC rejected on 01/10/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2018
  • FMC CORPORATION added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • FOSTER WHEELER LLC added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • GENUINE PARTS COMPANY added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Goulds Pumps Inc added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Grinnell LLC added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Peete, Louis; Peete, Rosie on 10/22/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Complaint filed by Peete, Louis; Peete, Rosie on 10/22/2018. Filed By: Peete, Louis(Plaintiff) | Peete, Rosie(Plaintiff) Refers To: ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD(Defendant) | Armstrong International Inc(Defendant) | Air Products and Chemicals Inc(Defendant) | Air & Liquid Systems Corp individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps Inc(Defendant) | Astro Pak Corporation(Defendant) | Alfa Laval Inc(Defendant) | Honeywell International Inc Individually and FKA Allied Signal Inc Successor in Interest to The Bendix Corporation(Defendant) | Huntington Ingalls Industries Inc(Defendant) | Gardner Denver Inc Individually and as Successor in Interest to Joy Manufacturing Co(Defendant) | Fryer Knowles Inc(Defendant) | Fisher Controls International LLC(Defendant) | Elliot Company(Defendant) | Eaton Corporation individually and as Successor in Interest to Eaton Electrical Inc and Cutler Hammer Inc(Defendant) | Cosmodyne LLC(Defendant) | BW IP Inc(Defendant) | Blackmer(Defendant) | Aurora Pump Company(Defendant) | Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations LLC(Defendant) | CARRIER CORPORATION(Defendant) | CBS Corporation a Delaware corporation fka Viacom Inc successor by merger to CBS Corporation a Pennsylvania corporation fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation(Defendant) | Cleaver Brooks Inc(Defendant) | Continental Maritime of San Diego Inc(Defendant) | CRANE CO(Defendant) | CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC(Defendant) | Flowserve Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation(Defendant) | FMC CORPORATION(Defendant) | FOSTER WHEELER LLC(Defendant) | GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY(Defendant) | GENUINE PARTS COMPANY(Defendant) | Goulds Pumps Inc(Defendant) | Grinnell LLC(Defendant) | Zurn Industries LLC(Defendant) | York International Corporation(Defendant) | Triple A Machine Shop Inc(Defendant) | SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR INC(Defendant) | Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC dba & individually and as successor in interest to Peerless Pump Company and Indian Head Inc(Defendant) | Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc(Defendant) | Warren Pumps LLC(Defendant) | Velan Valve Corp(Defendant) | Tuthill Corporation(Defendant) | Spirax Sarco Inc(Defendant) | Southwest Marine Inc(Defendant) | Pacific Ship Repair & Fabrication Inc(Defendant) | Owens Ilinois inc(Defendant) | National Steel & Shipbuilding Company(Defendant) | Nash Engineering Company(Defendant) | JT Thorpe & Son Inc(Defendant) | ITT LLC Individually and as Successor in Interest to Bell & Gossett Hoffman Specialty and Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Co Inc(Defendant) | IMO Industries Inc(Defendant) | INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY(Defendant) | LENNOX INDUSTRIES INC(Defendant) | Metalclad Insulation LLC(Defendant) | Mueller Steam Specialty(Defendant) | Nibco Inc(Defendant) | PNEUMO ABEX LLC(Defendant) | The Coleman Company Inc(Defendant) | THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY(Defendant) | Trane US Inc(Defendant) | South Bay Boiler Repair Inc(Defendant) | Eaton Corporation(Defendant) | Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HII SAN DIEGO SHIPYARD INC. [DOE 3 AND 503] is a litigant

Latest cases where COSMODYNE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC SHIP REPAIR & FABRICATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NIBCO Inc is a litigant