This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 14:06:44 (UTC).

Paul S Greenstein vs. Freeman & Associates Accountancy Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 Paul S Greenstein filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Freeman Associates Accountancy Corporation. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Greenstein, Paul S

Paladin Risk Management Limited

Defendants

Freeman & Associates Accountancy Corporation

Freeman, Steven Z

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nogues, Jean Pierre

NEVERS, GARY W.

Defendant Attorney

DEAN, Randall J.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (10 day jury trial); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 05/15/2019 at 10:30:00 AM in 22 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Jury Trial (LC) - (10 day jury trial) scheduled for 06/24/2019 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Greenstein, Paul S; Paladin Risk Management Limited on 02/21/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • Notice of Trial (and Mandatory Settlement Conference) filed by Greenstein, Paul S; Paladin Risk Management Limited on 08/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney (Old Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP New Gary W Nevers) filed by Paladin Risk Management Limited on 06/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney (Old Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP New Gary W Nevers) filed by Greenstein, Paul S on 06/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Answer (and Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Freeman & Associates Accountancy Corporation; Freeman, Steven Z on 05/02/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DEAN, Randall J. added as a effective 05/02/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (signed by Randall J. Dean on 4-10-18) filed by Greenstein, Paul S; Paladin Risk Management Limited on 04/12/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (signed by Randall J. Dean on 4-10-18) filed by Greenstein, Paul S; Paladin Risk Management Limited on 04/12/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/27/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Greenstein, Paul S; Paladin Risk Management Limited on 03/29/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Complaint filed by Greenstein, Paul S; Paladin Risk Management Limited on 03/29/2018. Filed By: Paladin Risk Management Limited(Plaintiff) | Greenstein, Paul S(Plaintiff) Refers To: Freeman & Associates Accountancy Corporation(Defendant) | Freeman, Steven(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEAN RANDALL J. ESQ.