This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 13:21:03 (UTC).

Patricia Shanks vs. State of California

Case Summary

On 08/22/2012 Patricia Shanks filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondent / Appellees

Shanks, Abigail

Shanks, Benjamin

Shanks, Patricia

Shanks, Samuel

Defendants and Appellants

The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

HOMAMPOUR, ARASH

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Chernin, Howard I

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Trial Setting Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 3:59 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 1:39 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 4:00 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:07 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Tax Costs (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
449 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Jane Doe Athorized Agent) filed by Shanks, Abigail; Shanks, Benjamin; Shanks, Patricia; Shanks, Samuel on 10/25/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Shanks, Abigail; Shanks, Benjamin; Shanks, Patricia; Shanks, Samuel rejected on 10/17/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Summons issued on 09/13/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (proposed GAL Patricia Shanks) filed by Shanks, Benjamin on 09/13/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (proposed GAL Patricia Shanks) filed by Shanks, Abigail on 08/30/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shanks, Patricia; Shanks, Samuel; Shanks, Benjamin; Shanks, Abigail on 08/22/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Complaint filed by Shanks, Patricia; Shanks, Samuel; Shanks, Benjamin; Shanks, Abigail on 08/22/2012. Filed By: Shanks, Patricia(Plaintiff) | Shanks, Samuel(Plaintiff) | Shanks, Benjamin(Plaintiff) | Shanks, Abigail(Plaintiff) Refers To: State of California(Defendant) | The People of The State of California acting by and through the Department of Transportation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less