This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 13:26:16 (UTC).

Patricia Payne vs. Joel Adler

Case Summary

On 05/27/2014 Patricia Payne filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Joel Adler. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Payne, Patricia

Defendants

Adler, Joel

Lee and Jackson Financial Inc.

LEE & JACKSON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DATZKER, LEIGH A.

Curtis, Herbert

Defendant Attorneys

Correa, Christopher G.

Engel, Thomas L.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 10:30 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:25 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 8:17 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 9:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Jury Trial (LC); Event Time: 1:30 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2014
  • Case Management Statement filed by Adler, Joel; Lee and Jackson Financial Inc. on 10/09/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2014
  • Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Payne, Patricia on 09/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2014
  • Answer filed by Adler, Joel; Lee and Jackson Financial Inc. on 07/07/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Denise Guerra office manager) filed by Payne, Patricia on 07/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Denise Guerra Office Manager and Person in Charge) filed by Payne, Patricia on 06/12/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal submitted by Payne, Patricia rejected on 06/03/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/24/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Payne, Patricia on 05/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by Payne, Patricia on 05/27/2014. Filed By: Payne, Patricia(Plaintiff) Refers To: Adler, Joel(Defendant) | Lee and Jackson Financial Inc.(Defendant) | LEE & JACKSON FINANCIAL SERVICES INC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less