This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/01/2021 at 12:24:53 (UTC).

Patricia Llamas vs. Michael Roa

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Patricia Llamas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michael Roa. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Llamas, Patricia

Defendant

Roa, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fobi, Emmanuel F.

Defendant Attorney

Brockenbrow, Karen

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:15 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Roa, Michael on 02/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Roa, Michael on 02/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed by Roa, Michael on 02/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 2:15 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 02/09/2021 02:15:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (56-2020-00547243-CU-OA-VTA) filed by Roa, Michael on 01/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Llamas, Patricia on 01/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/05/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Llamas, Patricia on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Llamas, Patricia on 11/19/2020. Filed By: Llamas, Patricia(Plaintiff) Refers To: Roa, Michael(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brockenbrow, Karen