This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 03/12/2023 at 10:01:18 (UTC).

Patrice Weiner vs. Jaspreet Somal MD APC

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 Patrice Weiner filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Jaspreet Somal MD APC. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bairdain, Sigrid

Weiner, Patrice

Defendants

Jaspreet Somal MD APC

Somal, Jaspreet

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cantor, Zachary

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Weiner, Patrice on 01/27/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/18/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons issued on 11/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Weiner, Patrice; Bairdain, Sigrid on 11/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Weiner, Patrice; Bairdain, Sigrid on 11/02/2022. Filed By: Weiner, Patrice(Plaintiff) | Bairdain, Sigrid(Plaintiff) Refers To: Somal, Jaspreet(Defendant) | Jaspreet Somal MD APC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less