This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 10:46:26 (UTC).

Papetti vs Air & Liquid Systems

Case Summary

On 03/02/2022 Papetti filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Air & Liquid Systems Corp individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps Inc

Arvinmeritor Inc

Atlantic Richfield Company

BJ Hughes Inc individually and as successor in interest to BJ Service Equipment Co

BNSF Railway Company individually and as successor in interest to Santa Fe Industries Santa Fe Pacific Corporation Westates Petroleum Company

BP Corporation North America Inc individually and as successor in interest to Amoco Corporation

BW IP Inc

Baker Hughes Incorporated

Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations Inc

Benjamin Moore & Company RP individually and as successor in interest to H B Fred Kuhls

Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corporation

C & H Sugar Company Inc California & Hawaiian Sugar Company Inc

Cameron International Corp individually and as successor in interest to Cameron Iron Works W K M Orbit Apollo Grove Wheatley

Caterpillar Inc

Championx Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Apergy Corporation

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP

Chevron USA Inc

Conocophillips Company

Crane Carrier Company

Crane Co individually and as successor in interest to Stockham Valves & Fittings Company, Chapman Valve Mfg Co and Alloy Steel Products Co

96 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Milbrodt, Jeremy D

MURRAY, JAMES G

Other Attorneys

Fishback, Stephen M.

CALARESO, CHRISTINE D

Schatz, Russell W

Khare, Viiu Spangler

POND, FRANK D.

JENKINS, CHARLES W.

Burke, John A.

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Karren, Brent M

Davis, Geoffrey M.

Nichols, Stephen M.

Dombrowski, Caren D

Duffy, Joseph

Talarico, Amy

Ameele, Melanie L

Dejardin, Bradford J.

Bray, Kendra E.

Carpenter, Erin

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:08 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preference; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Preference; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 2:03 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: (20 day estimate); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Status Conference; Description: (Further Status); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to defendant Viking Pump Inc ONLY) filed by Papetti, Salvatore D; Papetti, Loetta M on 06/23/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Intent to Appear and Participate at the Deposition of Plaintiff Savatore D Papetti) filed by Pneumo Abex LLC on 06/22/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance RA-010 filed by Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC on 06/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance RA-010 filed by Lufkin Industries Inc on 06/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance RA-010 filed by Championx Corporation on 06/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance RA-010 filed by Freeport McMoran Inc on 06/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance RA-010 filed by Pneumo Abex LLC on 06/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
375 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCameron International Corp individually and as successor in interest to Cameron Iron Works W K M Orbit Apollo Grove Wheatley added as a Defendant effective 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketC & H Sugar Company Inc California & Hawaiian Sugar Company Inc added as a Defendant effective 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketBW IP Inc added as a Defendant effective 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketBP Corporation North America Inc individually and as successor in interest to Amoco Corporation added as a Defendant effective 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketBorgwarner Morse Tec LLC as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corporation added as a Defendant effective 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketBNSF Railway Company individually and as successor in interest to Santa Fe Industries Santa Fe Pacific Corporation Westates Petroleum Company added as a Defendant effective 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketBJ Hughes Inc individually and as successor in interest to BJ Service Equipment Co added as a Defendant effective 03/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Papetti, Salvatore D; Papetti, Loetta M on 03/02/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Papetti, Salvatore D; Papetti, Loetta M on 03/02/2022. Filed By: Papetti, Loetta M(Plaintiff) | Papetti, Salvatore D(Plaintiff) Refers To: Air & Liquid Systems Corp individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps Inc(Defendant) | Arvinmeritor Inc(Defendant) | Atlantic Richfield Company(Defendant) | Baker Hughes Incorporated(Defendant) | Benjamin Moore & Company RP individually and as successor in interest to H B Fred Kuhls(Defendant) | Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations Inc(Defendant) | BJ Hughes Inc individually and as successor in interest to BJ Service Equipment Co(Defendant) | BNSF Railway Company individually and as successor in interest to Santa Fe Industries Santa Fe Pacific Corporation Westates Petroleum Company(Defendant) | Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corporation(Defendant) | BP Corporation North America Inc individually and as successor in interest to Amoco Corporation(Defendant) | BW IP Inc(Defendant) | C & H Sugar Company Inc California & Hawaiian Sugar Company Inc(Defendant) | Cameron International Corp individually and as successor in interest to Cameron Iron Works W K M Orbit Apollo Grove Wheatley(Defendant) | Caterpillar Inc(Defendant) | Championx Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Apergy Corporation(Defendant) | Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP(Defendant) | Chevron USA Inc(Defendant) | Conocophillips Company(Defendant) | Crane Carrier Company(Defendant) | Crane Co individually and as successor in interest to Stockham Valves & Fittings Company, Chapman Valve Mfg Co and Alloy Steel Products Co(Defendant) | Cummins Inc(Defendant) | Dap Inc(Defendant) | DCo LLC as successor in interest to Dana Companies LLC, Dana Corporation, Victor Manufacturing & Gasket Company, Spicer Manufacturing Corporation(Defendant) | Drilling Supply & Manufacturing Inc(Defendant) | E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company(Defendant) | Eaton Corporation(Defendant) | Exxonmobil Oil Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Mobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Chemical Company, Superior Oil Company, Socony Mobil Oil Company Inc, Standard Oil Company of New York(Defendant) | Exxon Mobil Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Standard Oil Company of New Jersey, Exxon Corporation, Exxon Company USA, Exxon Oil Company, Humble Oil & Refining Co(Defendant) | Montello Inc(Defendant) | Metalclad Insulation LLC individually and as successor in interest to Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Northern California Insulation(Defendant) | Marathon Oil Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Ohio Oil Company(Defendant) | Oil Well Service Co(Defendant) | Flowserve US Inc as successor in interest to Anchor Darling Valve Company, Edward Vogt Valve Co, Vogt Valve Company, Edward Valves Inc, Nordstrom Audco Inc, Nordstrom Valves Inc, Rockwell Manufacturing Co, Pacific Pumps(Defendant) | FMC Corporation(Defendant) | Gardner Denver Inc individually and as successor in interest to Joy Manufacturing Co(Defendant) | General Electric Company(Defendant) | Genuine Parts Company(Defendant) | Getty Oil Company(Defendant) | Geysers Geothermal Company(Defendant) | Goulds Pumps Inc individually and as successor in interest to GASO Pumps(Defendant) | Greene, Tweed & Co Inc(Defendant) | Grinnell LLC(Defendant) | Hanson Permanente Cement Inc(Defendant) | Helmerlich & Payne International Drilling Co(Defendant) | Hess Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Hess Oil & Chemical Corporation, Amerada Hess Corporation, Amerada Petroleum Corporation, Hess Tankship Corporation(Defendant) | Hill Brothers Chemical Company(Defendant) | Honeywell International Inc individually and fka Allied Signal Inc successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation(Defendant) | ITT Inc(Defendant) | J T Thorpe & Son Inc(Defendant) | Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc(Defendant) | Lufkin Industries Inc(Defendant) | Nov Inc individually and as successor in interest to Continental Emsco Drilling Products Inc, Milwaukee Valve, Mission Valves and Seats, Mission Pumps, National Supply Company and Oilwell Supply Co, Varco International Inc and Wheatley Gaso(Defendant) | MRC Global US Inc individually and as successor in interest to McJunkin Supply Company, Red Man Pipe and Supply Company, Chandler Boyd Supply, Buffalo Industrial Supply, Grant Supply Company, Appalachian Oilfield Pipe & Supply, Republic Supply of(Defendant) | Westates Petroleum Company(Defendant) | Weatherford International Inc(Defendant) | Viking Pump Inc(Defendant) | Viacomcbs Inc(Defendant) | Union Carbide Corporation(Defendant) | Union Oil Company of California(Defendant) | P E O Hair & Co(Defendant) | Pacific Refining Co(Defendant) | Parker Hannifin Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Sacomo Sierra, Parker Seal Company, and Rockwell Mechanical Packing(Defendant) | Pneumo Abex LLC(Defendant) | Reagan Equipment Co Inc(Defendant) | Reagan Power & Compression LLC individually and as successor in interest to Reagan Tool Company, Reagan Equipment Co Inc(Defendant) | Republic Supply Company(Defendant) | Schlumberger Technology Corporation(Defendant) | Shell Oil Company(Defendant) | Soco West Inc(Defendant) | Standco Industries Inc(Defendant) | Texaco Inc individually and as successor in interest to Getty Oil Company(Defendant) | The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(Defendant) | The WM Powell Company(Defendant) | Twin Disc Inc(Defendant) | Milwhite Inc(Defendant) | Scan Pac MFG Inc(Defendant) | Baker Hughes Oilfield Operations LLC(Defendant) | Baker Hughes Company(Defendant) | Freeport McMoran Inc(Defendant) | Ferguson Enterprises LLC(Defendant) | Getty Petroleum Marketing Inc(Defendant) | The William Powell Company(Defendant) | Benjamin Moore & Co(Defendant) | Gardner Denver Inc(Defendant) | National Oilwell Varco LP individually and as successor in interest to Oil Well Supply Co(Defendant) | FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump business(Defendant) | Air & Liquid Systems Corporation as successor by merger to Buffalo Pumps Inc(Defendant) | DCo LLC(Defendant) | Goulds Pumps LLC(Defendant) | P E O Hair & Co(Defendant) | ITT LLC(Defendant) | Shell USA Inc(Defendant) | BP Corporation North America Inc(Defendant) | Cameron International Corporation(Defendant) | Morse TEC LLC fka BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC as successor by merger to Borg Warner Corp(Defendant) | Freeport McMoran Inc(Defendant) | Marathon Oil Company(Defendant) | Metalclad Insulation LLC(Defendant) | Crane Co(Defendant) | Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co(Defendant) | Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP(Defendant) | Parker Hannifin Corporation sued individually and as successor in interest to Sacomo Sierra(Defendant) | MRC Global US Inc(Defendant) | Texaco Inc(Defendant) | BNSF Railway Company(Defendant) | Anchor Darling Valve Company(Defendant) | Flowserve US Inc solely as successor to Edward Valves Inc Rockwell Manufacturing Company Nordstrom Valves Inc Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Co(Defendant) | Exxon Mobil Corporation(Defendant) | Exxonmobil Oil Corporation(Defendant) | Hess Corporation(Defendant) | C&H Sugar Company Inc(Defendant) | California & Hawaiian Sugar Company Inc(Defendant) | Weatherford International LLC(Defendant) | ConocoPhillips Company(Defendant) | NOV Inc individually and as successor by merger to Varco International Inc and as successor in interest to Mission Valves and Seats and Mission Pumps(Defendant) | Championx Corporation(Defendant) | Baker Hughes Holding LLC(Defendant) | National Oilwell Varco LP as successor in interest to National Supply Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crane Carrier Company is a litigant

Latest cases where C & H Sugar Company Inc California & Hawaiian Sugar Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES OILFIELD OPERATIONS INC is a litigant