Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 00:00:24 (UTC).

Pacificrealtors.net vs. David Klein

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Pacificrealtors net filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against David Klein. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pacificrealtors.net

Defendants

CB Property Management Inc

Glassman, Stephen A

Klein, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHULAK, MICHAEL T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Pacificrealtors.net on 08/21/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Case Management Statement filed by Pacificrealtors.net on 08/14/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/21/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacificrealtors.net on 03/27/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Complaint filed by Pacificrealtors.net on 03/27/2019. Filed By: Pacificrealtors.net(Plaintiff) Refers To: CB Property Management Inc(Defendant) | Klein, David(Defendant) | Glassman, Stephen(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CB PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHULAK MICHAEL T.