This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 10/25/2023 at 17:03:15 (UTC).

Old Republic Insurance vs. Mora

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Old Republic Insurance filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mora. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CUPA

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Old Republic Insurance Company

Defendant

Mora, Kenneth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LLOYD, PRISCILLA W.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Old Republic Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

04/19/2023: Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Old Republic Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

 

Docket Entries

01/15/2024

HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Status: Vacated; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice; Result: Not Held - Vacated by Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketCourt Order scheduled for 01/15/2024 at 08:15 AM in at Department 22B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to the entire subcase of Complaint filed by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY on 11/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Old Republic Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2022

DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/15/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Old Republic Insurance Company on 11/18/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2022

DocketComplaint filed by Old Republic Insurance Company on 11/18/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less