This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 17:05:47 (UTC).

Ocegueda vs. Channel Islands Surgicenter

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Ocegueda filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Channel Islands Surgicenter. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ocegueda, Alyssa

Ocegueda, Daniel

Defendants

Channel Islands Surgicenter LP

Motamedi MD, Ali

Motamedi MD, Ali R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez, April

Defendant Attorneys

DIAMOND, SCOTT R

Maxwell, John T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Motamedi MD, Ali R on 10/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketMotamedi MD, Ali R added as a Defendant effective 10/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (signed by John T Maxwell; Attorney) filed by Ocegueda, Alyssa; Ocegueda, Daniel on 10/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Doe 1 as to Ali Motamedi MD) filed by Ocegueda, Daniel on 09/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMotamedi MD, Ali added as a Defendant effective 09/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Ocegueda, Alyssa on 08/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Channel Islands Surgicenter LP on 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Channel Islands Surgicenter LP on 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Channel Islands Surgicenter LP on 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDIAMOND, SCOTT R added as a effective 07/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist) filed by Ocegueda, Alyssa on 06/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 04/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (GAL Daniel Ocegueda) filed by Ocegueda, Alyssa on 04/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Proposed GAL Daniel Ocegueda received, Forwarded to J.O. for signature) received from Ocegueda, Alyssa on 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOcegueda, Daniel added as a Guardian Ad Litem effective 04/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ocegueda, Alyssa on 04/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ocegueda, Alyssa on 04/09/2021. Filed By: Ocegueda, Alyssa(Plaintiff) | Ocegueda, Daniel(Plaintiff) Refers To: Channel Islands Surgicenter LP(Defendant) | Motamedi MD, Ali(Defendant) | Motamedi MD, Ali(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramirez, A