This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/11/2018 at 16:51:11 (UTC).

Nustad vs. Coffin

Case Summary

On 10/20/2009 Nustad filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Coffin. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nustad, Roger

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Realco Properties LTD

Schulze News Company Inc

Cabler, Jim

Coffin, Jeff

Jeff Coffin Construction Company Inc

Schulze News Company, Inc.

Schulze, Allan

Cross Defendants, Intervenors and Interested Parties

Lloyd's of London

Schulze News Company Inc

Cabler, Jim

Coffin, Jeff

Jeff Coffin Construction Company Inc

Schulze News Company, Inc.

Schulze, Allan

Not Classified By Court

Oak River Insurance Company

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Higson, Daniel A

Intervenor, Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

REESHA, EDWARD J

CHO, HOWARD

Haffner, Matthew M

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 3:44 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 9:06 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:03 PM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
362 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2009
  • Schulze News Company, Inc. added as a Defendant effective 11/17/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by Serving Norman L Blue) filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/27/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by subserving Norman Blue) filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/27/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (& Statement of Damages by serving Cordaine Leavitt) filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/23/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (& Statement of Damages) filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/23/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • Statement of Damages (being sought) filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/20/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/20/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/20/2009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • Complaint filed by Nastad, Roger on 10/20/2009. Filed By: Nustad, Roger(Plaintiff) | Lloyd's of London(Interested Party) Refers To: Schulze News Company, Inc.(Defendant) | Coffin, Jeff(Defendant) | Jeff Coffin Construction Company Inc(Defendant) | Cabler, Jim(Defendant) | Schulze News Company Inc(Defendant) | Schulze, Allan(Defendant) | Realco Properties LTD(Defendant) | Oak River Insurance Company(Lien Claimaint)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.